Trustees THE BRITISH SPORTS TRUST
Charity number: 1095326
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gulnaz Raja | Trustee | 10 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Euan Spence | Trustee | 04 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Neil Cameron | Trustee | 04 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth North | Trustee | 04 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Judith Norrington | Trustee | 24 January 2018 |
|
|||||
Jill Lanning | Trustee | 28 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Richard Ramsey | Trustee | 28 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Shaun Dowling | Trustee | 17 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dominic Goggins | Trustee | 03 March 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.