THE OLD SCHOOLHOUSE COMMUNITY PROJECT

Charity number: 1097390
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £193.87k £264.03k £384.10k £335.42k £285.54k
Total expenditure £164.34k £252.78k £256.93k £373.51k £216.21k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £5.20k N/A N/A