SFAC

Charity number: 1095091
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £56.66k £58.80k £142.71k £121.70k £139.15k
Total expenditure £71.15k £67.94k £108.51k £135.48k £141.56k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A