Financial history BARLBOROUGH PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1095476
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £8.65k £9.18k £18.68k £2.79k £3.33k
Total expenditure £12.86k £10.68k £13.76k £11.48k £1.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £10.00k N/A N/A