Governing document THE OADBY AND WIGSTON U3A
Charity number: 1096039
Charity reporting is overdue by 181 days
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 APRIL 2002 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018 AS AMENDED ON 30 OCT 2019 as amended on 21 Nov 2022 as amended on 27 Feb 2024
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
OADBY & WIGSTON AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY.
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.