Financial history TORAH & CHESED LIMITED

Charity number: 1096106
Charity reporting is overdue by 450 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £85.27k £123.89k £121.04k £77.90k £16.96k
Total expenditure £96.26k £106.61k £93.68k £104.44k £4.36k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A