Trustees WORSBROUGH SPORTS AND DEVELOPMENT ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1097312
Charity reporting is up to date (181 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WAYNE JOHNSON | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Raymond Pinder | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jillian Eyre | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
JASON ALDERTON | Trustee | 19 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Toone | Trustee | 11 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alan Littlewood | Trustee | 15 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Kenneth Bywater | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.