Financial history THE UNHEARD VOICES TRUST

Charity number: 1097339
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £299.62k £339.43k £297.67k £281.19k £273.10k
Total expenditure £173.10k £252.00k £225.56k £145.19k £139.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A