PIE FACTORY MUSIC

Charity number: 1097561
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £148.63k £214.24k £272.07k £290.60k £276.99k
Total expenditure £149.69k £174.49k £252.95k £262.29k £261.82k
Income from government contracts £120.52k £187.72k £236.93k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £225.62k £262.50k