Financial history THE LONDON CARLBACH SHUL TRUST

Charity number: 1098107
Charity reporting is overdue by 39 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £347.70k £283.04k £404.43k £129.26k £74.03k
Total expenditure £325.22k £336.93k £362.98k £131.53k £73.96k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A