GREAT LAKES OUTREACH

Charity number: 1097267
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £964.18k £971.67k £1.09m £1.20m £1.67m
Total expenditure £827.34k £1.08m £1.03m £1.08m £1.73m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £954.44k £966.11k £1.08m £1.19m £1.66m
Income - Other trading activities £7.88k £3.29k £7.55k £9.05k £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £8.21k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.86k £2.28k £2.30k £2.31k £2.31k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £822.58k £1.06m £1.02m £1.06m £1.73m
Expenditure - Raising funds £4.76k £12.92k £14.33k £13.36k £4.61k
Expenditure - Governance £3.01k £3.00k £6.14k £6.59k £9.52k
Expenditure - Grants institution £568.92k £864.17k £739.93k £792.51k £1.44m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0