Financial history 2ND WITHAM BOYS' BRIGADE

Charity number: 1098237
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £74.83k £98.88k £59.96k £57.38k £66.73k
Total expenditure £65.00k £98.05k £59.48k £55.29k £62.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £4.00k £23.68k £11.00k