AMERA INTERNATIONAL LIMITED

Charity number: 1098788
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021
Total gross income £115.51k £15.13k £1.46k £4.93k £150
Total expenditure £66.87k £28.02k £21.66k £23.11k £27.35k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A