THE BATTERSEA FELLOWSHIP TRUST

Charity number: 1097935
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 11 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2019 19 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2018 14 April 2019 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2017 11 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2016 11 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 Not Required