Financial history 5 VALLEY CAT RESCUE

Charity number: 1098105
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £11.32k £14.67k £10.44k £21.97k £7.79k
Total expenditure £27.29k £18.84k £11.65k £17.62k £8.46k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A