Trustees MARTLESHAM BRASS

Charity number: 1100922
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Matthew Colin Aldous Chair 06 March 2015
None on record
Elizabeth Mary Benyon Trustee 14 November 2023
None on record
Emma Benyon Trustee 10 March 2023
None on record
Sean Neil Marner Trustee 04 March 2022
None on record
Melissa Katherine Hawkins Trustee 06 October 2020
None on record
Suzanne Mary Lovie Trustee 06 October 2020
None on record
Tamsin Tate Trustee 08 March 2019
None on record
Mrs L Boardman Trustee 09 March 2018
None on record
CHRISTOPHER DEREK HOWARD Trustee 10 March 2017
None on record
Geraldine Susan Armes Trustee 06 March 2015
None on record
PAUL ROBERT BENYON BSC MIEE Trustee 06 March 2015
None on record
MARK CHALKLEN Trustee 06 March 2015
None on record
MARY ANN ALDOUS Trustee 06 March 2015
None on record
ADAM THOMAS CABLE Trustee 06 March 2015
None on record
MRS E M HOWARD Trustee 06 March 2015
None on record