Financial history HEREFORD DIOCESAN GUILD OF BELLRINGERS

Charity number: 1105766
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £6.40k £6.18k £6.69k £6.42k £170
Total expenditure £5.96k £5.84k £6.28k £5.41k £4.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A