THE MRS F M KAYE-KRZECZKOWSKI CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1098717
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £1.12k £1.21k £1.14k £1.16k £1.14k
Total expenditure £56 £60 £1.96k £1.76k £1.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A