ST CUTHBERTS SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1098256
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £2.39k £3.32k £1.81k £1.73k £0
Total expenditure £403 £872 £500 £954 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A