Governing document CRICCIETH FAMILY CHURCH
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 APR 2003 AS AMENDED ON 11 MAR 2004 AS AMENDED ON 25 MAY 2016 AS AMENDED ON 17 MAY 2017 as amended on 18 Mar 2020 as amended on 19 May 2021 as amended on 20 Sep 2023
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS BY ANY APPROPRIATE MEANS AS THE LEADERSHIP TEAM IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL DETERMINE. TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF CRICCIETH ANY EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE RELIEF OF POVERTY SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AS THE LEADERSHIP TEAM IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
FOR THE INHABITANTS OF CRICCIETH.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.