Financial history SOMALI FAMILY LEARNING AND REGENERATION PROJECT

Charity number: 1109365
Charity reporting is overdue by 173 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £18.43k £23.54k £16.80k £9.86k £9.86k
Total expenditure £15.53k £24.74k £15.36k £6.41k £8.01k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A