WORLDWIDE VETERINARY SERVICE

Charity number: 1100485
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £1.36m £1.23m £2.10m £1.57m £1.79m
Total expenditure £1.56m £1.36m £1.60m £1.41m £1.74m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £45.36k £140.79k £398.44k £117.80k £269.88k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.32m £1.09m £1.70m £1.45m £1.52m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £220 £89 £38 £532 £973
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £38.00k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.56m £1.36m £1.60m £1.41m £1.74m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £3.70k £0 £0 £5.50k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £108.69k £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0