THE FRIENDS OF ST JAMES THE GREAT, EAST MALLING

Charity number: 1099170
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £7.45k £8.74k £6.08k £38.31k £7.55k
Total expenditure £2.40k £4.30k £3.29k £20.17k £22.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A