Governing document BROCKWORTH LINK
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06 MAY 2003 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 31 OCT 2017 as amended on 21 Sep 2020 as amended on 19 Aug 2021 as amended on 15 Apr 2022 as amended on 27 Jan 2024
Charitable objects
(A) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS INCLUDING THE ELDERLY AND THE DISABLED BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF: (I) ADVICE AND INFORMATION REGARDING THEIR LEGAL ENTITLEMENTS PARTICULARLY (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) STATE BENEFITS, HOUSING CONSUMER MATTERS AND DEBT AND (II) FACILITIES AND SERVICES TO RELIEVE PERSONS SUFFERING FROM SUBSTANCE ADDICTION TOGETHER WITH THE FAMILIES OF SUCH PERSONS. (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AMONGST PERSONS RESIDENT WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT (C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AS ARE BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
THE BENEFIT AREA SHALL PRIMARILY BE THE CIVIL PARISH OF BROCKWORTH, THE WIDER COUNTY OF GLOUCESTERSHIRE AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.