Financial history RESPONSE ORGANISATION

Charity number: 1101071
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £9.16m £9.52m £10.96m £14.01m £17.50m
Total expenditure £8.36m £9.15m £10.53m £13.89m £17.25m
Income from government contracts £3.80m £3.94m £4.47m £5.90m £8.37m
Income from government grants £0 N/A £162.50k £412.03k £98.16k
Income - Donations and legacies £430.44k £437.50k £394.77k £41.50k £62.93k
Income - Other trading activities £4.64k £3.87k £0 £319.77k £917.41k
Income - Charitable activities £8.33m £9.07m £10.56m £13.64m £16.52m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.12k £6.02k £7.76k £1.14k £1
Income - Other £388.93k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £8.36m £9.08m £10.44m £13.81m £17.19m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.54k £64.58k £90.15k £75.55k £59.98k
Expenditure - Governance £16.75k £26.07k £43.23k £76.00k £55.09k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0