Trustees RESPONSE ORGANISATION
Charity number: 1101071

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicola Inge | Trustee | 03 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sheetal Gill | Trustee | 18 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jackie Yates | Trustee | 15 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Mary Leece | Trustee | 15 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Cyara Buchuck-Wilsenach | Trustee | 15 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Wendy Woodhouse OBE | Trustee | 03 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Edwards | Trustee | 07 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
DR Robert Keith Sutcliffe | Trustee | 17 July 2018 |
|
|||||
Ellen Hazel Nicholson | Trustee | 25 July 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.