CHRISTIAN SCIENCE SOCIETY, WINCHESTER

Charity number: 1103015
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 24 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 05 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 25 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required