Trustees ST ERME PLAYING FIELD TRUST
Charity number: 1101129
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT TRETHEWEY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Andrew Gould | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karen Gould | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anthea May Prowse | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dale Hanns-Drake | Trustee | 17 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Mills | Trustee | 27 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Bridger | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Henry Michael Edwards | Trustee | 26 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Hitchman | Trustee | 11 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Joy Mounter | Trustee | 26 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Phillip Hodgkinson | Trustee | 06 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Tristan Jewel | Trustee | 28 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Light | Trustee | 28 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Bowerman | Trustee | 10 June 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.