Trustees QUARANTINE
Charity number: 1100469
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Natasha Howes | Chair | 19 November 2014 |
|
|
||||||
Frances Anne Healey | Trustee | 04 May 2023 |
|
|||||||
Angela Thomas | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Michelle Roberta Rocha | Trustee | 13 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Shaquille Rayes | Trustee | 08 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
CHRISTOPHER BISHOP | Trustee | 03 November 2014 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.