STORYBOOK DADS

Charity number: 1101208
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £159.96k £122.19k £214.85k £219.76k £211.48k
Total expenditure £161.86k £145.57k £184.25k £191.29k £184.63k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A