SHOBDON CHURCH PRESERVATION TRUST

Charity number: 1100957
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £7.66k £10.15k £5.16k £909 £17.61k
Total expenditure £811 £3.43k £602 £844 £4.18k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A