THE ORTHODOX CHRISTIAN CHURCH TRUST OF ST AETHELHEARD LINCOLNSHIRE

Charity number: 1102841
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £18.23k £7.86k £9.69k £8.65k £8.46k
Total expenditure £17.36k £4.50k £5.93k £6.87k £7.02k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A