PATCH RESOURCE SERVICES

Charity number: 1100716
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £720 £720 £720 £720 £720
Total expenditure £664 £622 £613 £2.41k £613
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A