Financial history ABBOTS FARM JUNIOR SCHOOL PTFA

Charity number: 1100821
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £7.09k £6.77k £2.52k £2.28k £6.23k
Total expenditure £5.44k £6.44k £5.81k £2.33k £4.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A