LUTON ALL WOMEN CENTRE

Charity number: 1101754
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £214.67k £259.81k £297.81k £271.81k £304.75k
Total expenditure £226.76k £243.00k £219.10k £298.71k £344.39k
Income from government contracts £206.87k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £119.00k N/A £119.00k £39.05k