SEARCH AND RESCUE ASSISTANCE IN DISASTERS

Charity number: 1101593
Charity reporting is up to date (85 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £73.32k £33.75k £16.49k £23.80k £26.90k
Total expenditure £45.19k £45.12k £40.41k £17.35k £25.02k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £15.04k N/A N/A N/A