TRIMLEY RED DEVILS FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity number: 1102408
Charity reporting is up to date (63 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £9.58k £9.56k £19.89k £19.93k £21.89k
Total expenditure £9.68k £9.24k £15.43k £23.90k £18.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £2.72k N/A £10.00k