Financial history Beaminster Preschool Limited

Charity number: 1102042
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £72.64k £72.73k £75.47k £73.42k £76.02k
Total expenditure £79.58k £84.16k £92.64k £80.11k £75.46k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A £53.65k
Income from government grants £60.22k N/A £68.31k £65.64k £7.27k