Governing document POOL HOUSE UNDER FIVES NURSERY
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 APRIL 1999 AS AMENDED ON 13 OCTOBER 2003 AND 1 APRIL 2004 as amended on 26 Jan 2010 as amended on 26 Jan 2010 as amended on 18 Mar 2020 as amended on 18 Mar 2020 as amended on 19 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
The aim of the Charity is to enhance the development and education of children primarily under statutory school age by encouraging parents to understand and provide for the needs of their children through community groups and by: a. Offering appropriate play facilities and training courses, together with the right of parents to take responsibility for and to become involved in the activities of such groups, ensuring that such groups offer opportunities for all children whatever their race, culture, religion, means or ability. b. Encouraging the study of the needs of such children and their families and promoting public interest in and recognition of such needs in the local areas. c. Instigating and adhering to and furthering the aims of Pre-school Learning Alliance.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.