SABRE EDUCATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1105489
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £815.89k £951.84k £752.05k £1.19m £941.37k
Total expenditure £686.27k £835.30k £793.27k £931.56k £1.10m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £88.03k £87.26k £29.96k N/A £121.47k
Income - Donations and legacies £815.82k £951.77k £730.91k £1.18m £934.46k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £21.10k £3.47k £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £70 £66 £45 £1.47k £5.23k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £1.69k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £577.10k £700.03k £645.32k £790.38k £950.30k
Expenditure - Raising funds £109.18k £135.27k £147.95k £141.18k £147.06k
Expenditure - Governance £10.03k £10.04k £15.53k £53.14k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0