Trustees COLLEGE OF SEXUAL AND RELATIONSHIP THERAPISTS
Charity number: 1101961
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lohani Noor | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Markie Louise Christianson Twist | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Imelda Hatton Yeo | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Murray Blacket | Trustee | 15 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cate Campbell | Trustee | 15 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Richmond Johnson | Trustee | 16 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Hazel Katherine Wright | Trustee | 08 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL WESTWOOD | Trustee | 09 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dana Braithwaite | Trustee | 06 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Edwards | Trustee | 06 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Tim Blackstone | Trustee | 06 June 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.