Trustees HARBORNE AND EDGBASTON U3A
Charity number: 1101356
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Worwood | Chair | 02 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Susan Hendry | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Jane Street | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Priestman | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Charles Cairns-Lawrence | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Veronica Richards | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian Maurice Trotter | Trustee | 29 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Worwood | Trustee | 24 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Cannadine | Trustee | 02 December 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.