Financial history ACTION FOR BOW

Charity number: 1104269
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £1.68m £15.89k £16.46k £785 £15.33k
Total expenditure £126.12k £168.62k £210.25k £219.07k £123.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £2.17k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £1.68m N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £126.12k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A