Financial history WADHAM COLLEGE

Charity number: 1139726
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £12.90m £14.52m £14.88m £14.91m £11.43m
Total expenditure £11.93m £12.09m £12.51m £12.31m £12.60m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £3.55m £5.18m £5.47m £5.91m £4.96m
Income - Other trading activities £281.00k £264.00k £236.00k £191.00k £19.00k
Income - Charitable activities £6.42m £6.64m £6.63m £6.01m £6.47m
Income - Endowments £687.00k £150.00k £466.00k £135.00k £599.00k
Income - Investment £2.65m £2.58m £2.55m £2.42m £2.58m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £376.00k £411.00k
Income - Legacies £2.86m £5.03m £1.27m £133.79k £888
Expenditure - Charitable activities £10.92m £11.14m £11.62m £11.45m £11.80m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.01m £952.00k £892.00k £862.00k £798.00k
Expenditure - Governance £18.00k £20.00k £20.00k £20.00k £3.38m
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £266.00k £134.00k £109.00k £108.00k £140.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0