Financial history THE ST. JOHN'S SCHOOL CENTRE

Charity number: 1102207
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £7.22k £12.38k £19.74k £8.00k £7.84k
Total expenditure £2.55k £2.60k £6.96k £34.84k £8.19k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A