Financial history CALVARY LOVE EVANGELICAL FELLOWSHIP

Charity number: 1101637
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £21.88k £20.00k £22.78k £17.39k £13.71k
Total expenditure £20.49k £17.85k £20.94k £16.86k £12.50k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A