THE BARBARA PRICE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1101846
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £14.51k £14.35k £14.81k £15.96k £17.59k
Total expenditure £16.78k £21.44k £23.89k £33.33k £42.73k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A