THE ELDA LATIN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1106734
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £18.43k £19.26k £18.94k £20.45k £14.05k
Total expenditure £32.30k £31.59k £30.97k £32.58k £25.54k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A