Trustees WANDSWORTH MEDIATION SERVICE

Charity number: 1102464
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MR STEPHEN RUTTLE Chair
MARY RUTTLE CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT
Received: On time
Sarah Spreckley Trustee 17 November 2020
THE BAILEY GATEWAY TRUST
Received: On time
Sharon Crooks Trustee 10 December 2018
None on record
Stephen Kelly Trustee 13 November 2018
None on record
Philip Guthrie Trustee 13 November 2018
None on record
Katie Finch Trustee 13 November 2018
None on record
Clare Jane de Beer Trustee 11 October 2016
None on record
Hilary Suzanne Campbell Brodsky Trustee 09 February 2015
None on record