ST MARY'S PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION (CREDENHILL)

Charity number: 1101800
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 22/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £6.26k £5.57k £7.61k £9.91k £3.06k
Total expenditure £6.74k £5.18k £6.89k £6.41k £3.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A